THE JOHN AND SUSAN BOWERS FUND

Charity number: 266616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download