Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL KIDNEY PATIENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 266660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 September 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required