Financial history FRIENDS OF UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON HOSPITALS

Charity number: 266669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £78.83k £76.33k £82.46k £77.53k £64.35k
Total expenditure £80.03k £88.93k £161.90k £135.40k £149.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A