FRIENDS OF UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON HOSPITALS

Charity number: 266669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tom Hughes Trustee 15 September 2016 None on record
Ros Jacobs Trustee 18 November 2018 None on record
Katie Ginger Trustee 27 November 2014 None on record
SUSAN PRISCILLA AIRD Trustee
THE AIRD CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Jo Baktis Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
John Sparrowhawk Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Dr MICHAEL SHIPLEY Trustee 26 November 2013
HUGHES SYNDROME FOUNDATION Received: On time
Maggie Gormley Trustee 25 November 2013 None on record
Rev PETER DAVID OWEN HARRIES OP Trustee 14 January 2016 None on record
Diana Mary Scarrott Chair 10 November 2017 None on record
Angela Wedgwood Trustee 26 November 2015 None on record