Accounts and annual returns THE GWENETH MOXON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 266672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 23 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 16 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window