Financial history THE GWENETH MOXON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 266672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £36.67k £33.51k £34.61k £17.66k £12.02k
Total expenditure £37.79k £35.68k £32.46k £15.25k £38.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A