Accounts and annual returns ARGOSY PLAYERS

Charity number: 266728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 18 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window