BROADSTAIRS YOUTH AND LEISURE CENTRE

Charity number: 266873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 29 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 08 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required