BROADSTAIRS YOUTH AND LEISURE CENTRE

Charity number: 266873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £18.54k £15.85k £4.63k £20 £0
Total expenditure £7.41k £8.63k £2.85k £58.15k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A