PARISH ROOM (FARNHAM)

Charity number: 266935
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £6.50k £4.82k £5.09k £7.11k £6.61k
Total expenditure £6.39k £4.90k £5.41k £6.75k £5.98k