AREA MUSEUMS SERVICE FOR SOUTH EASTERN ENGLAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 27 June 1991: Standard registration
- 27 July 1991: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 1963 AS AMENDED 27 MAY 1964, 20 MAY 1965, 22 JULY 1965 AND 25 JUNE 1974.
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST PUBLIC MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES AND THEIR DEVELPOMENT AND TO PROMOTE THIER USE AND ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC IN THE FOLLOWING COUNTIES BEDFORDSHIRE, BERKSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, CAMBRIDGESHIRE, ESSEX, HAMPSHIRE, HERTFORDSHIRE, ISLE OF WIGHT, GREATER LONDON, NORFOLK, OXFORDSHIRE, SUFFOLK, SURREY, EAST SUSSEX ,WEST SUSSEX AND THE CHANNEL ISLANDS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.