HENLEY-ON-THAMES DAY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 266950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH HODGKIN Trustee
THE EYOT CENTRE Received: On time
THE THAMESFIELD YOUTH ASSOCIATION Received: On time
HENLEY EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Lorraine Hillier Trustee 20 September 2021 None on record
MRS G M DODDS Chair
THE EYOT CENTRE Received: On time
THE THAMESFIELD YOUTH ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Elizabeth Hodgkin Trustee 20 September 2021 None on record
Sarah Louise Miller Trustee 10 May 2019
RIVER AND ROWING MUSEUM FOUNDATION Received: On time
HENLEY EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Kenneth Arlett Trustee 22 August 2018 None on record
CLLR DAVID STEPHEN EGGLETON Trustee 14 August 2017 None on record
MR D FRYER Trustee 04 September 2011 None on record