Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST BARNABAS HOSPITAL SALTASH

Charity number: 266967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 06 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required