THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The RNA is a rank-blind membership organisation primarily for serving and former serving RN personnel and the wider naval family, who are proud of their Naval Service. We seek to maintain the naval ethos and enjoy sharing experiences with like minded people while supporting each other in times of need. The mission of the RNA is to foster camaraderie through events, comms and welfare support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£762,645
Donations and legacies | £708.27k | |
Charitable activities | £9.93k | |
Other trading activities | £11.03k | |
Investments | £33.41k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£718,613
Raising funds | £22.35k | |
Charitable activities | £696.26k | |
Other | £0 |
£40,354 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £22.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £696.26k | |
Retained for future use | £44.03k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £22.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £696.26k | |
Retained for future use | £84.39k |
People

12 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
1700 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Cyprus
- France
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Japan
- Malta
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
Governance
- 06 February 1974: Standard registration
- 28 April 2014: Funds received from 1073894 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LISS & DISTRICT BRANCH
- 24 July 2015: Funds received from 1071317 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HAVANT BRANCH
- 08 January 2016: Funds received from 1071207 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION MANOR PARK BRANCH
- 04 March 2019: Funds received from 1072494 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HALIFAX BRANCH
- 15 November 2021: Funds received from 1068495 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION HEREFORD BRANCH
- 11 January 2023: Funds received from 1069176 WIGSTON & DISTRICT BRANCH ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION
- 02 February 2024: Funds received from 1068802 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION CHESTER BRANCH
- 14 February 2024: Funds received from 1077782 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION DRIFFIELD BRANCH
- 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1064972 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION (DEAL & WALMER BRANCH)
- 16 February 2024: Funds received from 1071645 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION BIRMINGHAM SHELDON BRANCH
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 1070953 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION BROMLEY BRANCH
- 22 February 2024: Funds received from 1068282 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION NUMBER 2 AREA
- 14 March 2024: Funds received from 1068800 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION PADDOCK WOOD BRANCH
- 14 March 2024: Funds received from 1068800 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION PADDOCK WOOD BRANCH
- 09 August 2024: Funds received from 1067116 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LUTON AND DUNSTABLE BRANCH
- 20 November 2024: Funds received from 1067924 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA BRANC...
- 06 December 2024: Funds received from 1076779 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION SIDCUP BRANCH
- 06 December 2024: Funds received from 1068284 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION MARKET HARBOROUGH BRAN...
- 06 December 2024: Funds received from 1068284 THE ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION MARKET HARBOROUGH BRAN...
- 28 April 2025: Funds received from 1072724 ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION LLANELLI BRANCH
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vice Admiral Duncan Laurence Potts CB | Chair | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Potter | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Harries | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christie | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Elliot | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stirling Simmons | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roslyn Hastie-Murray | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Chivers | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Warwick Ian Belfitt | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Louise Robson | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Lance Higgon-Young | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Irvin | Trustee | 03 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stephenson | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Mark Slawson OBE | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Marguarita Lock MBE | Trustee | 14 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY KEITH RIDLEY MBE | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £365.53k | £324.73k | £278.24k | £213.42k | £762.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £518.84k | £302.54k | £402.18k | £278.24k | £718.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £708.27k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.03k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.93k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £33.41k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £233.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £696.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £49.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.56k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.54k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.40m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £397.10k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £162.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 15TH JULY 1954 AS AMENDED BY ROYAL CHARTER OF 24TH OCTOBER 1973 AND 13 DECEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER THE EFFICIENCY OF THE SERVICE IN WHICH MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION HAVE SERVED OR ARE SERVING BY FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS AND PRESERVING THE TRADITIONS OF THE SERVICE AND THUS TO ACHIEVE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH OUR NAVAL FORCES HAVE FOUGHT AND TO PERPETUATE THE MEMORY OF THOSE MEMBERS OF OUR NAVAL FORCES WHO HAVE DIED IN THE SERVICE OF THEIR COUNTRY. (B) TO RELIEVE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Central Office
Lanyard House
Scott Road
HM Naval Base
Portsmouth
PO1 3LU
- Phone:
- 02392722983
- Email:
- admin@royalnavalassoc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window