THE PETER AND MARY RALLI MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 267237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 January 2021 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 01 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required