THE FRIENDS OF PIRTON PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 267281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.01k £9.76k £10.48k £10.32k £6.16k
Total expenditure £143 £18.62k £28.30k £121 £18.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A