Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S CHURCH, ORMESBY SOCIETY

Charity number: 267334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.78k £3.07k £2.33k £625 £0
Total expenditure £1.56k £2.25k £1.14k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A