THE DVORAK SOCIETY

Charity number: 267336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.78k £14.94k £11.34k £11.22k £9.90k
Total expenditure £13.82k £16.29k £16.27k £16.43k £8.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A