WOODLANDS ESTATE RESIDENT FREEHOLDERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a voluntary Community Association. We maintain premises for social and community activities for all ages eg Whist drives, Parent and Toddler, Film shows, Illustrated talks, Summer Fun Day, Quizzes, Social Events. We also welcome a local Special Needs School to use the open space and sports courts, and we support local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hounslow
Governance
- 22 August 1974: Standard registration
- W E R F A (Working name)
- WERFA (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER HACK | Chair | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Louise Cowley | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Carter | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Elizabeth Diment | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katy Rosslyn Cooper | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Thorburn | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Agnieszka Agata Hack | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE PERRIN | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Hecht | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARION HUFFER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.56k | £5.60k | £13.75k | £25.12k | £25.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.56k | £5.63k | £11.45k | £11.64k | £26.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.31k | £10.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSITUTION ADOPTED 27TH JANUARY 1972
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOODLAND ESTATE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WOODLANDS ESTATE AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 WOODLAND GARDENS
ISLEWORTH
TW7 6LN
- Phone:
- 02085607121
- Email:
- werfa@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window