Financial history THE HOUNSLOW ARTS TRUST LTD

Charity number: 267426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.72m £1.77m £2.00m £1.74m £1.30m
Total expenditure £1.78m £1.72m £1.89m £1.68m £1.31m
Income from government contracts £347.26k £901.23k £995.28k £768.26k £100.00k
Income from government grants £661.64k £100.58k £120.70k £120.70k £123.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £1.05m £1.17m £963.94k £1.22m
Income - Other trading activities £133.82k £134.03k £158.38k £168.75k £24.74k
Income - Charitable activities £506.65k £587.06k £669.10k £603.68k £49.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £26 £32 £155 £287 £49
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.75m £1.68m £1.86m £1.64m £1.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.29k £1.54k £32.95k £34.05k £35.47k
Expenditure - Governance £33.56k £27.43k £33.18k £31.98k £37.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £31.70k £31.24k £4.22k £2.63k £421