COL WILFRED HORATIO MICHOLLS DECEASED CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 267472
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)