COL WILFRED HORATIO MICHOLLS DECEASED CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 267472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.73k £21.00k £20.77k £21.86k £22.26k
Total expenditure £22.00k £21.50k £21.50k £21.50k £23.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A