Accounts and annual returns GORING AND FERRING FRIENDSHIP CENTRE (GORING BRANCH)

Charity number: 267524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 March 2021 06 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 14 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 14 March 2019 31 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 14 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 14 March 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 14 March 2017 Not Required