Accounts and annual returns THE METROPOLITAN CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 267563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 10 April 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 March 2022 351 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 02 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 30 May 2019 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required