Financial history THE METROPOLITAN CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 267563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A