Financial history WHITEHILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 267564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £54.38k £63.64k £48.07k £95.94k £61.80k
Total expenditure £23.23k £80.29k £56.36k £125.52k £30.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.26k £22.68k N/A £95.35k N/A