Financial history GREEN AND LILIAN F M AINSWORTH AND FAMILY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 267577
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/01/2018 17/01/2019 17/01/2020 17/01/2021 17/01/2022
Total gross income £42.32k £42.99k £22.83k £14.88k £27.64k
Total expenditure £39.54k £42.23k £42.71k £38.78k £22.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A