BOROUGH OF ENFIELD VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (BEVAD)

Charity number: 267585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required