BOROUGH OF ENFIELD VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE DISABLED (BEVAD)

Charity number: 267585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.12k £8.13k £9.85k £8.88k £5.25k
Total expenditure £14.77k £14.77k £8.02k £11.85k £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A