THE FRIENDS OF JEWISH SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN

Charity number: 267647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,490
Total expenditure: £6,724

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 1974: Standard registration
  • 09 June 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 27 March 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF JEWISH SERVICEMEN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louis Trup Chair 27 September 2023
None on record
Dr Lynette Judaea Schoen Nusbacher Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Commander Daniel Gerald Weil Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
ASHLEY CHARLES SWEETLAND Trustee 22 February 2019
None on record
Major DANNY SHARPE Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.77k £12.96k £4.51k £1.60k £9.49k
Total expenditure £8.60k £6.91k £6.04k £6.19k £6.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Rutherford Way
Bushey Heath
Bushey
WD23 1NJ
Phone:
07890847631
Website:

No information available