5TH IPSWICH (ST ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.27k £18.65k £16.71k £17.29k £17.22k
Total expenditure £15.85k £15.39k £16.73k £14.12k £22.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.76k