Accounts and annual returns 13TH NORTHAMPTON (ST MARYS FAR COTTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 267769
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required