CAPEL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 267775

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steve Bishop Trustee 22 September 2019 None on record
JON BUNKELL Trustee 19 March 2018 None on record
Gareth Millar Trustee 22 February 2021 None on record
Stephanie Georgina Bonfield Trustee 15 March 2021 None on record
Derek Stuart O'Galligan Trustee 04 May 2021 None on record
Sarah Smy Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
DAVID BUSBY Trustee 22 February 2017 None on record
Chris Whitley Chair 27 September 2021 None on record