BRIDPORT AND WEST DORSET SPORTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 267781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas John Thornley Trustee 24 September 2019 None on record
Nicholas Chandler Trustee 30 May 2019 None on record
Allan Staerck Trustee 01 October 2013 None on record
Peter Brook Trustee 01 October 2013
THE BEAMINSTER FESTIVAL AND THE FRIENDS OF THE BEAMINSTER FESTIVAL Received: On time
Frederick Fowler Trustee 23 March 2021 None on record
John Wright Trustee 29 September 2015 None on record
MALCOLM HEAVER Chair None on record
ALEC BAILEY MA, FCA Trustee
DORSET COUNTY MUSEUM MUSIC SOCIETY Received: On time
DORSET COUNTY MUSEUM MUSIC SOCIETY Received: On time
THE DORCHESTER ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH INTO LOCAL HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY Received: On time