OAKLEY RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.98k £15.76k £9.17k £17.89k £17.84k
Total expenditure £15.94k £16.48k £9.71k £18.30k £18.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A