THE ELINOR ROBINSON BURSARY

Charity number: 267922
Charity reporting is overdue by 671 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 305 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 305 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 671 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 14 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 07 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required