INAS (ITALIAN WELFARE) LIMITED

Charity number: 267945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £354.20k £382.85k £391.97k £385.53k £401.87k
Total expenditure £344.64k £377.78k £370.12k £351.47k £343.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A