EAST WORLINGTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 267969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £47.88k £70.03k £118.67k £24.77k £19.91k
Total expenditure £87.13k £52.58k £48.57k £110.99k £5.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £700 £1.25k £1.70k £300 £18.34k