EAST WORLINGTON PARISH HALL

Charity number: 267969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANGELA LUNN Trustee 12 January 2017 None on record
Raymond Victor Bassingthwaighte Trustee 12 January 2017 None on record
SANDY HAUGHTON Trustee None on record
Catherine Elizabeth Guppy Trustee 20 November 2013 None on record
Jonathan Harford Trustee 14 July 2016 None on record
Margaret Good Trustee 19 May 2020 None on record
ELIZABETH LAURA BRIDGET HURST-BANNISTER Trustee None on record
Nigel Sedgwick Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
MARK SHIPLEY Trustee 14 May 2020 None on record
BRIAN WALTON EDWARDS Trustee 07 June 2013 None on record
Nigel Pankhurst Trustee 13 May 2021 None on record
STEPHEN BABER Chair None on record
Maxine Difford Trustee 10 May 2018 None on record