HYTHE AND DIBDEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 267994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.84k £33.37k £44.65k £37.93k £50.51k
Total expenditure £37.57k £42.10k £40.70k £41.42k £34.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £34.53k