LILLINGTON AND LONGMOORE GARDENS RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association has established a community centre on the Estate and aims to promote membership, establish the views of members, represent members' interests, provide information to, and a forum for discussion among, members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £48,890 from 6 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 July 1977: Standard registration
- LILLINGTON GARDENS TENANTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlene Torey | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Strafford | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.20k | £32.32k | £41.54k | £3.86k | £74.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.94k | £50.58k | £41.62k | £5.42k | £39.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.36k | £3.97k | N/A | £48.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 May 2025 | 841 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 May 2025 | 841 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2022 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2022 | 431 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2022 | 431 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH MAY 1977 AS AMENDED 26 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF LILLINGTON AND LONGMOORE GARDENS ESTATES AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS AS DEFINED ABOVE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF AND IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS
Area of benefit
LILLINGTON AND LONGMOORE GARDENS ESTATES, ALL WITHIN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA OF THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER (THE AREA) AND SUCH NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Linked charities
- 12 July 1977 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Under Morgan House
57 Vauxhall Bridge Road
London
SW1V 2LF
- Phone:
- 07592 809431
- Email:
- lalgra551@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window