Trustees LANGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 268187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN CADMAN Chair
None on record
Clifford Frank Jones Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Charlotte Elaine Parker Trustee 14 July 2021
FRIENDS OF LANGHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
Sallie Louise West Trustee 28 May 2021
None on record
Martin John Bottwood Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Susan Thorpe Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Paul Jeremy Armstrong Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Maureen Shouksmith Trustee 19 May 2016
None on record
ELIZABETH WINTER Trustee 19 May 2016
None on record
James Puxley Trustee 21 May 2015
None on record
Mark Kleingeld Trustee 15 May 2014
None on record
DENISE HOBDAY Trustee 15 May 2014
None on record
BOB SCHOFIELD Trustee 11 February 2012
None on record
ELIZABETH SCHOFIELD Trustee
None on record