THE HOWARD DE WALDEN CENTRE

Charity number: 268203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £44.23k £67.06k £44.46k £98.22k £77.41k
Total expenditure £35.58k £28.99k £39.67k £133.26k £34.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £12.50k