TAVISTOCK AND DISTRICT COUNCIL OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 268247
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION 24TH APRIL 1974, AS AMENDED ON 19TH MAY 1998 AND 10 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN TAVISTOCK AND DISTRICT AND IN PARTICLUAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 24 September 1974 : registered
  • 13 January 2009 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (GI))
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body