Accounts and annual returns BRIGHTON AND HOVE CHARITABLE YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 268268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 March 2021 301 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 March 2021 667 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required