Financial history BRIGHTON AND HOVE CHARITABLE YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 268268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £600 £638 £384 £78 £78
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A