Accounts and annual returns GLADSTONE DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 268326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 05 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window