Financial history GLADSTONE DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 268326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £235.14k £199.90k £224.17k £310.95k £316.63k
Total expenditure £201.72k £211.98k £225.32k £235.84k £284.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £26.78k £93.02k
Income from government grants £0 N/A £36.35k £10.00k £93.02k