Accounts and annual returns THE ABBEYFIELD BURNHAM AND HIGHBRIDGE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 268379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 July 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 11 July 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 27 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 August 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 17 August 2022 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 31 August 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 31 August 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 October 2020 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 06 October 2020 68 days late Download Open in new window