ISLINGTON LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 268468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.68m £1.68m £1.46m £1.83m £1.76m
Total expenditure £1.63m £1.67m £1.63m £1.66m £1.57m
Income from government contracts £0 £101.39k £142.67k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £654.40k £587.20k £450.00k £450.00k £460.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £53.91k £274.20k £90.31k £82.59k £90.57k
Income - Other trading activities £28.63k £33.10k £15.47k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.60m £1.38m £1.35m £1.75m £1.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.20k £1.04k £283 £48 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.63m £1.67m £1.63m £1.66m £1.57m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £21.09k £28.19k £11.20k £0 £58.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0